Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7074 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024

Prefiled

Bill February 15, 2024