House | 04/04/2025 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | CS Filed | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Reported out of Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Favorable with CS by Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | PCS added to Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/02/2025 | Now in Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/02/2025 | Referred to Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Filed |