House
|
04/29/2025
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Substituted for CS/SB 524
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/23/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported out of Health Care Budget Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Favorable with CS by Health Care Budget Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Added to Health Care Budget Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Now in Health Care Budget Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Reported out of Health Professions & Programs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Favorable by Health Professions & Programs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added to Health Professions & Programs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Now in Health Professions & Programs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Health Care Budget Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Health Professions & Programs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|