Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1089 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025
Bill April 1, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025
Analysis March 20, 2025
Analysis March 19, 2025