House
|
05/02/2025
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported out of Housing, Agriculture & Tourism Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Favorable by Housing, Agriculture & Tourism Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Added to Housing, Agriculture & Tourism Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Now in Housing, Agriculture & Tourism Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Housing, Agriculture & Tourism Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|