House | 04/30/2025 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1574 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | CS Filed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Reported out of Economic Infrastructure Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Favorable by Economic Infrastructure Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Added to Economic Infrastructure Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Now in Economic Infrastructure Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Economic Infrastructure Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Filed |