|
04/29/2025
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2025
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Substituted for SB 7008
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/26/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|