Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/29/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/02/25, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 03/18/25, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/18/25, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|