Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0344 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 2, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025
Analysis March 20, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025
Analysis February 19, 2025
Analysis February 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 20, 2025
Bill February 19, 2025