House
|
04/24/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/17/25, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 03/18/25, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/04/25, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|