Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0398 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2025
Analysis April 16, 2025
Analysis March 18, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025
Analysis March 5, 2025
Analysis March 3, 2025