Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1455
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1455
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/22/25, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/15/25, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/25, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|