Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0716 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2025
Analysis April 21, 2025
Analysis April 16, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Analysis March 12, 2025
Analysis March 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 12, 2025