Senate | 04/10/2025 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/10/25, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/17/25, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Filed |