Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0978 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 10, 2025
Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis March 18, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 18, 2025