Senate | 04/10/2025 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/10/25, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/01/25, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Filed |