Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 10, 2025
Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025