Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 989
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 989
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --If Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/10/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/12/25, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|