Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2025
Analysis April 15, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis March 13, 2025
Analysis March 11, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2025
Bill March 13, 2025