Senate | 04/29/2025 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/29/2025) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/25 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 4 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/26/25, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/17/25, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Filed |