Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 26, 2025
Analysis March 25, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025