Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1574 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2025
Analysis April 21, 2025
Analysis April 15, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Analysis April 3, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025
Bill April 3, 2025