Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/30/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/10/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/18/25, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|