Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1808 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill March 20, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2025
Analysis April 15, 2025
Analysis April 10, 2025
Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis March 20, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025