Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 1101
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Substituted HB 1101
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/22/25, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/10/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/25, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|