Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1842 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2025
Bill April 14, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2025
Analysis April 21, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis March 26, 2025
Analysis March 24, 2025