Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 7003
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Substituted HB 7003
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/08/25, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/01/25, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/18/25, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/03/25, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Submitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance
|
|
|