Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2025
Analysis April 7, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025
Analysis March 4, 2025
Analysis February 28, 2025

Prefiled

Bill February 24, 2025