House | 12/06/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 12/04/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Senate Hopper |