04/24/2024 | Effective Date 2024-04-24 | |||
04/24/2024 | Act 483 | |||
House | 04/24/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Hopper |