Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Hopper |