04/22/2024 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |||
04/22/2024 | Act 392 | |||
House | 04/22/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Recommitted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House Hopper |