Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2024
Bill March 2, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023