Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Recommitted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House Hopper |