1 | 1 | | 23 LC 49 1306 |
---|
2 | 2 | | H. B. 457 |
---|
3 | 3 | | - 1 - |
---|
4 | 4 | | House Bill 457 |
---|
5 | 5 | | By: Representatives Ballard of the 147 |
---|
6 | 6 | | th |
---|
7 | 7 | | , Erwin of the 32 |
---|
8 | 8 | | nd |
---|
9 | 9 | | , Wade of the 9 |
---|
10 | 10 | | th |
---|
11 | 11 | | , Dubnik of the |
---|
12 | 12 | | 29 |
---|
13 | 13 | | th |
---|
14 | 14 | | , Corbett of the 174 |
---|
15 | 15 | | th |
---|
16 | 16 | | , and others |
---|
17 | 17 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
18 | 18 | | AN ACT |
---|
19 | 19 | | To amend Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia |
---|
20 | 20 | | 1 |
---|
21 | 21 | | Annotated, relating to employment under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to remove2 |
---|
22 | 22 | | the needs development rating from the group of performance evaluation ratings which may3 |
---|
23 | 23 | | adversely impact an educator's ability to obtain a renewable certificate from the Georgia4 |
---|
24 | 24 | | Professional Standards Commission; to remove the needs development rating from the group5 |
---|
25 | 25 | | of performance evaluation ratings which shall be reported by local school systems to the6 |
---|
26 | 26 | | Georgia Professional Standards Commission; to remove the needs development rating from7 |
---|
27 | 27 | | the group of performance evaluation ratings which may adversely impact an educator's8 |
---|
28 | 28 | | ability to obtain a year of creditable service on the state's minimum salary schedules; to9 |
---|
29 | 29 | | provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.10 |
---|
30 | 30 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF GEORGIA:11 |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 1.12 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated,13 |
---|
33 | 33 | | relating to employment under the "Quality Basic Education Act," is amended in Code14 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Section 20-2-200, relating to regulation of certificated professional personnel by Professional15 |
---|
35 | 35 | | Standards Commission, rules and regulations, and fees, by revising subsection (c) as follows:16 23 LC 49 1306 |
---|
36 | 36 | | H. B. 457 |
---|
37 | 37 | | - 2 - |
---|
38 | 38 | | "(c) An individual who has received any combination of two unsatisfactory, or ineffective,17 |
---|
39 | 39 | | or needs development annual summative performance evaluations in the previous five-year18 |
---|
40 | 40 | | period pursuant to Code Section 20-2-210 shall not be entitled to a renewable certificate19 |
---|
41 | 41 | | prior to demonstrating that such performance deficiency has been satisfactorily addressed,20 |
---|
42 | 42 | | but such individual may apply to the commission for a nonrenewable certificate, as defined21 |
---|
43 | 43 | | by the commission. Each local school system and charter school shall report all22 |
---|
44 | 44 | | unsatisfactory, and ineffective, and needs development ratings of all performance23 |
---|
45 | 45 | | evaluations as provided in Code Section 20-2-210 for certificated personnel in their employ24 |
---|
46 | 46 | | in a manner, format, and frequency determined by the commission. The commission is25 |
---|
47 | 47 | | authorized to release such data provided it cannot be personally identifiable to any26 |
---|
48 | 48 | | currently or formerly certificated person."27 |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 2.28 |
---|
50 | 50 | | Said part is further amended in Code Section 20-2-212, relating to salary schedules, by29 |
---|
51 | 51 | | revising subsection (a) as follows:30 |
---|
52 | 52 | | "(a) The State Board of Education shall establish a schedule of minimum salaries for31 |
---|
53 | 53 | | services rendered which shall be on a ten-month basis and which shall be paid by local32 |
---|
54 | 54 | | units of administration to the various classifications of professional personnel required to33 |
---|
55 | 55 | | be certificated by the Professional Standards Commission. The minimum salary schedule34 |
---|
56 | 56 | | shall provide a minimum salary base for each classification of professional personnel35 |
---|
57 | 57 | | required to be certificated; shall provide for increment increases above the minimum salary36 |
---|
58 | 58 | | base of each classification based upon individual experience and length of satisfactory37 |
---|
59 | 59 | | service; and shall include such other uniformly applicable factors as the state board may38 |
---|
60 | 60 | | find relevant to the establishment of such a schedule. The minimum salary base for39 |
---|
61 | 61 | | certificated professional personnel with bachelor's degrees and no experience, when40 |
---|
62 | 62 | | annualized from a ten-month basis to a 12 month basis, shall be comparable to the41 |
---|
63 | 63 | | beginning salaries of the recent graduates of the University System of Georgia holding42 23 LC 49 1306 |
---|
64 | 64 | | H. B. 457 |
---|
65 | 65 | | - 3 - |
---|
66 | 66 | | bachelor's degrees and entering positions, excluding professional educator teaching |
---|
67 | 67 | | 43 |
---|
68 | 68 | | positions, in Georgia having educational entry requirements comparable to the44 |
---|
69 | 69 | | requirements for entry into Georgia public school teaching. The placement of teachers on45 |
---|
70 | 70 | | the salary schedule shall be based on certificate level and years of creditable experience,46 |
---|
71 | 71 | | except that a teacher shall not receive credit for any year of experience in which the teacher47 |
---|
72 | 72 | | received an unsatisfactory or ineffective annual summative performance evaluation or for |
---|
73 | 73 | | 48 |
---|
74 | 74 | | the second year in which a teacher receives two consecutive annual summative needs49 |
---|
75 | 75 | | development ratings pursuant to Code Section 20-2-210. The General Assembly shall50 |
---|
76 | 76 | | annually appropriate funds to implement a salary schedule for certificated professional51 |
---|
77 | 77 | | personnel. For each state fiscal year, the state board shall adopt the salary schedule for52 |
---|
78 | 78 | | which funding has been appropriated by the General Assembly. A local unit of53 |
---|
79 | 79 | | administration shall not pay to any full-time certificated professional employee a salary less54 |
---|
80 | 80 | | than that prescribed by the schedule of minimum salaries, except as required by this Code55 |
---|
81 | 81 | | section; nor shall a local unit of administration pay to any part-time certificated56 |
---|
82 | 82 | | professional employee less than a pro rata portion of the respective salary prescribed by the57 |
---|
83 | 83 | | schedule of minimum salaries, except as required by this Code section. For purposes of58 |
---|
84 | 84 | | this subsection, an educator's placement on the salary schedule shall not be based on a59 |
---|
85 | 85 | | leadership degree, which shall mean a degree earned in conjunction with completion of an60 |
---|
86 | 86 | | educator leadership preparation program approved by the Professional Standards61 |
---|
87 | 87 | | Commission, unless the educator is employed in a leadership position as defined by the62 |
---|
88 | 88 | | State Board of Education, but shall be placed on the salary schedule position attributable63 |
---|
89 | 89 | | to the educator but for the leadership degree; provided, however, that this shall not apply,64 |
---|
90 | 90 | | regardless of whether or not he or she is in a leadership position, to:65 |
---|
91 | 91 | | (1) An educator who possessed a leadership degree prior to July 1, 2010; or66 |
---|
92 | 92 | | (2) An educator who possessed:67 |
---|
93 | 93 | | (A) A master's level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2012;68 |
---|
94 | 94 | | (B) An education specialist level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2013; or69 23 LC 49 1306 |
---|
95 | 95 | | H. B. 457 |
---|
96 | 96 | | - 4 - |
---|
97 | 97 | | (C) A doctoral level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2014, |
---|
98 | 98 | | 70 |
---|
99 | 99 | | so long as he or she was enrolled in such leadership preparation program on or before71 |
---|
100 | 100 | | April 1, 2009."72 |
---|
101 | 101 | | SECTION 3.73 |
---|
102 | 102 | | All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.74 |
---|