04/13/2023 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |||
04/13/2023 | Act 9 | |||
House | 04/13/2023 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | House Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Hopper |