LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Georgia GA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB538
Draft Versions
GA
Georgia House Bill HB538
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session
Georgia House Bill HB538
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 22, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 31, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 3, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 21, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 6, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 2, 2023
Compare