Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024