Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Hopper |