Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House Hopper |