05/06/2024 | Act 603 | |||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Senate Hopper |