Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB19 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2024
Bill April 3, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023