LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Georgia GA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB32
Draft Versions
GA
Georgia Senate Bill SB32
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session
Georgia Senate Bill SB32
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 26, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 1, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
March 18, 2024
Compare
Bill
March 15, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 15, 2023
Compare