Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB32 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-24 LC 47 3042S
1+23 LC 49 1421S
2+S. B. 32 (SUB)
3+- 1 -
24 The House Committee on Education offers the following substitute to SB 32:
35 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 To amend Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated,1
68 relating to public school property and facilities, so as to require local education agencies to2
79 implement a mobile panic alert system capable of connecting disparate emergency services3
810 technologies to ensure real-time coordination between multiple state and local first responder4
911 agencies in the event of a school security emergency; to provide for exceptions; to require5
1012 the Department of Administrative Services to conduct market research and possibly issue a6
1113 competitive solicitation for multiple vendors to provide for such systems; to provide for a7
1214 short title; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting8
1315 laws; and for other purposes.9
1416 BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF GEORGIA:10
1517 SECTION 1.11
1618 This Act shall be known and may be cited as "Alyssa's Law."12
1719 SECTION 2.13
1820 Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to14
19-public school property and facilities, is amended by adding a new part to read as follows:15
21+public school property and facilities, is amended by adding a new part to read as follows:15 23 LC 49 1421S
2022 S. B. 32 (SUB)
21-- 1 - 24 LC 47 3042S
23+- 2 -
2224 "Part 416
2325 20-2-590.17
24-(a)(1) Not later than July 1, 2026, each local education agency, as that term is defined18
26+(a)(1) Not later than July 1, 2024, each local education agency, as that term is defined18
2527 in Code Section 20-2-167.1, shall implement a mobile panic alert system capable of19
2628 connecting disparate emergency services technologies to ensure real-time coordination20
2729 between local and state law enforcement and first responder agencies. Such system shall21
28-be known as the 'Alyssa's Alert' and shall integrate with existing technology found in22
29-each local public safety answering point infrastructure to transmit 9-1-1 calls and mobile23
30-activations.24
31-(2) In addition to the requirements of paragraph (1) of this subsection, each local25
32-education agency may implement additional strategies or systems to ensure real-time26
33-coordination between multiple first responder agencies in the event of a school security27
34-emergency.28
35-(3) A local education agency shall not be required to procure or implement new or29
36-additional capabilities if, as of July 1, 2025, such local education agency has already30
37-implemented a mobile panic alert system with capabilities which meet the requirements31
38-of paragraph (1) of this subsection.32
39-(b) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Department of Administrative Services shall33
40-conduct market research in consultation with the State School Superintendent and the34
41-Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency to identify whether an35
42-existing competitive source of supply is available for a system that satisfies the36
43-requirements of paragraph (1) of subsection (a) of this Code section from multiple vendors37
44-for use by local education agencies. If no existing source of supply exists, the Department38
45-of Administrative Services shall issue a competitive solicitation for such source of supply39
46-no later than January 1, 2026."40
47- S. B. 32 (SUB)
48-- 2 - 24 LC 47 3042S
49-SECTION 3.41
50-This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2024.42
51-SECTION 4.43
52-All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.44
30+be known as the 'Alyssa's Alert' and shall integrate with local public safety answering22
31+point infrastructure to transmit 911 calls and mobile activations.23
32+(2) In addition to the requirements of paragraph (1) of this subsection, each local24
33+education agency may implement additional strategies or systems to ensure real-time25
34+coordination between multiple first responder agencies in the event of a school security26
35+emergency.27
36+(3) A local education agency shall not be required to procure or implement new or28
37+additional capabilities if, as of July 1, 2023, such local education agency has already29
38+implemented a mobile panic alert system with capabilities which meet the requirements30
39+of paragraph (1) of this subsection.31
40+(b) Not later than December 1, 2023, the Department of Administrative Services shall32
41+conduct market research in consultation with the State School Superintendent and the33
42+Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency to identify whether an34
43+existing competitively procured source of supply is available for a system that satisfies the35
44+requirements of paragraph (1) of subsection (a) of this Code section from multiple vendors36
45+for use by local education agencies. If no existing source of supply exists, the Department37
46+of Administrative Services shall issue a competitive solicitation for such source of supply38
47+no later than January 1, 2024."39 23 LC 49 1421S
5348 S. B. 32 (SUB)
5449 - 3 -
50+SECTION 3.40
51+This Act shall become effective July 1, 2023.41
52+SECTION 4.42
53+All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.43