Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB36 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024
Bill March 23, 2023
Bill February 2, 2023