04/24/2024 | Act 489 | |||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senate Hopper |