House | 03/13/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Hopper |