Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB433 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 20, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024