04/22/2024 | Act 425 | |||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Hopper |