Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 14, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024